THE LANCASTER DISTRICT MOBILITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offer financial assistance to organisations providing transport to people who have mental/physical disabilities. For example, small monetary grants to help with transport costs and vehicle leasing options.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 20 October 1982: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mervyn Bonnett | Chair | 16 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Diane Crompton | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Geertje Hermina Cornelia Leeson | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Alston | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Tyson | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steven Robert Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.02k | £2.49k | £2.51k | £2.51k | £2.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £17.00k | £20.50k | £33.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 May 2025 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 MARCH 1982
Charitable objects
A. THE RELIEF AND CARE OF PERSONS OF EITHER SEX (WITHOUT REGARD TO RACE OR CREED) WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS OR MENTAL OR PHYSICAL HANDICAP. B. FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE OBJECTS ASSOCIATED WITH TRANSPORT FACILITIES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SEE FIT. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1 OF DECLARATION OF TRUST)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LANCASTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Akeman Close
MORECAMBE
LA3 3BP
- Phone:
- 0152468331
- Email:
- mandvbonnett@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window