Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN TICEHURST
Charity number: 1180171

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD ASHLEY FRANCIS EVANS | Chair | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Mackenzie | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frances Harris | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Louise Barratt | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA DOROTHY MINET | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA HOWITT | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE LINDSEY EVANS | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN COOK | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH DIANA WHITEMAN | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY HUNNEYBELL | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Reeves | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|||||
JACQUELINE KAYE SCOTT WARD | Trustee | 24 April 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.