Accounts and annual returns STEPPING STONES PRE-SCHOOL (HASTINGS & ST LEONARDS)

Charity number: 1179315
Charity reporting is overdue by 716 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 351 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 351 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 716 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 716 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 March 2021 269 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 March 2021 269 days late Download Open in new window