ASSOCIATION FOR MEDICAL HUMANITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The AMH is a Learned Society based in the UK promoting the development of the medical and health humanities through: an annual conference, council meetings, regional meetings, an associated journal (Medical Humanities) and a website (amh.ac.uk). It welcomes members from a broad range of disciplines and practices within medicine, healthcare, the arts and humanities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bulgaria
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 June 2019: CIO registration
- AMH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JENNIFER JANE PATTERSON PHD FHEA | Chair | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bridget MacDonald | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR JO WINNING | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Z¾E JANE PLAYDON BA(HONS), PGCE, MA, PHD, MED(DIST), | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE NEVILLE SUMMERS FRCS | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr LINDA MAUREEN TURNER MA Ed | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL GERARD VAN DESSEL BSC FRCGP | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joseph Patrick O'Dwyer | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr ANGELA JANE HODGSON-TEALL MA MSc PHD | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr DEBORAH GAY PADFIELD PHD, FHEA | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.53k | £3.46k | £5.68k | £4.70k | £7.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £909 | £1.64k | £9.32k | £1.50k | £7.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2024 | 345 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2024 | 345 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2024 | 710 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2024 | 710 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 144 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE, PRACTICE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE INTERDISCIPLINARY FIELD OF MEDICAL HUMANITIES THE PROMOTION OF HIGH STANDARDS IN THE EDUCATION AND PRACTICE OF MEDICAL HUMANITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
118 THE BANK
NORTH STREET
TURNERS HILL
CRAWLEY
- Phone:
- 07949009989
- Email:
- president@amh.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window