Accounts and annual returns POLISH SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL CORBY

Charity number: 1181317
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 21 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 April 2022 293 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 19 April 2022 293 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 December 2020 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 14 December 2020 167 days late Download Open in new window