Accounts and annual returns ARK BYRON PRIMARY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1179961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 September 2021 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required