THE HEREDITARY SPASTIC PARAPLEGIA SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes meetings for those with HSP to meet others. It gives grants to individuals to alleviate the effects of HSP. It supports research into the condition. It provides via its web site and Newsletters information about HSP and management of the condition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 January 2019: CIO registration
- 08 February 2021: Funds received from 1109398 THE HEREDITARY SPASTIC PARAPLEGIA SUPPORT GROUP
- HSP SUPPORT GROUP (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Lawrence | Chair | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Thomas Payne | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Estelle Marshall | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Payne | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MASON | Trustee | 24 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Juan Vazquez-Ruiz | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mitesh Patel | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HARRIS | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Michael Cain | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.27k | £14.25k | £32.74k | £19.43k | £31.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.35k | £21.99k | £29.59k | £26.47k | £39.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 166 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 11 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE:- 1)TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERS OF HSP IN GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCE, ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE; 2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PROFESSIONALS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO HSP. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS THE ORGANISATION MAY PROVIDE SUPPORT TO ACTIVITIES WHOSE OUTCOME MAY LEAD TO BENEFITS TO THOSE WITH HSP.
Area of benefit
IN GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 LODMOOR AVENUE
WEYMOUTH
DT3 5AF
- Phone:
- 01305772286
- Email:
- dave@vadcar.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window