LONDON HISTORICAL FENCING CLUB

Charity number: 1181581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kerri-Nicola McArthur Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
Emma Burton Trustee 27 July 2018 None on record
James MacIver Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
James Tamplin Chair 01 September 2020 None on record
Daniel Weir Trustee 27 September 2016 None on record
Dan Powell Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record