THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARTINS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer religious services as a parish church of the Church of England as well as community support and pastoral care to parishioners of St Martin's Hereford. We serve the whole community, and have specific services to support the elderly, the marginalised, the bereaved and families and children. Our property is used by groups from across the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,192 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 24 August 2018: Standard registration
- HEREFORD SOUTH WYE TEAM MINISTRY (Working name)
- HSWTM (Working name)
- ST MARTINS FOODSHARE (Working name)
- ST MARTINS PCC (Working name)
- ST MARTINS WITH ST FRANCIS PCC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ANNE MARJORIE DOWDESWELL | Chair | 14 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
JULIA DAWN WARE | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
IRENE ELIZABETH GOODMAN | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLY ANNE MERRITT | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY NORMAN RAWCLIFFE | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANTHONY EDEN | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.30k | £105.66k | £136.29k | £136.33k | £155.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.78k | £95.99k | £92.88k | £125.27k | £164.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.49k | £8.57k | £7.58k | £2.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEREFORD & SOUTH WYE TEAM MINISTRY
89 ROSS ROAD
HEREFORD
HR2 7RJ
- Phone:
- 01432353717
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window