THE FOSDYKE PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 512600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required