THE FOSDYKE PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 512600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.78k £4.93k £3.20k £6.32k £15.55k
Total expenditure £3.03k £3.98k £2.41k £1.20k £830
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A