GOLD GEESE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting children through childhood cancer treatments and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £5,800 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 March 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATIE ELLEN SOUTHGATE | Chair | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sally Bailey | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Sterry | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elena Bays | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Peters | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANNA VICTORIA WHYTE | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
LOUISETTE MARGUERITE MULLIN | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.46k | £95.80k | £125.56k | £143.08k | £231.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.14k | £60.43k | £112.81k | £149.34k | £185.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS AND SUFFERING OF CHILDREN WITH CANCER BEING CARED FOR IN PAEDIATRIC ONCOLOGY UNITS IN SOUTHEND UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, GREAT ORMOND STREET HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY COLLEGE HOSPITAL LONDON AND SUCH OTHER SPECIALIST CARE CENTRES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING ITEMS AND SERVICES TO SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES/CARERS DESIGNED TO ENHANCE THEIR PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL HEALTH, EASE THEIR SUFFERING AND/OR PROVIDE COMFORT AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT. B) RAISING AWARENESS OF BLOOD DONATION, STEM CELL REGISTRATIONS AND SWABBING FOR POTENTIAL BONE MARROW DONORS TO ASSIST WITH RELIEVING THE SICKNESS OF SUCH CHILDREN. 2) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF BEREAVED PARENTS/CARERS AND SIBLINGS OF CHILDREN WHO HAVE LOST THEIR LIVES DUE TO CANCER BY THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, SERVICES, ACTS OF REMEMBRANCE, GIFTS, TRIPS AND/OR TICKETS TO EVENTS DESIGNED TO ENHANCE THEIR EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL HEALTH, EASE THEIR SUFFERING AND/OR PROVIDE COMFORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGSLEY HOUSE
22-24 ELM ROAD
LEIGH-ON-SEA
ESSEX
SS9 1SN
- Phone:
- 01702808285
- Email:
- hello@goldgeese.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window