Trustees UNLOCKED GRADUATES

Charity number: 1187552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID ANTHONY LAWS Chair 04 July 2018
None on record
Angela Daniel Trustee 09 October 2022
None on record
Nathan Anthony White Trustee 14 March 2022
None on record
Thomas Patrick James Shinner Trustee 27 February 2022
None on record
Emma Jane Wilson Trustee 07 December 2021
None on record
Nicola Louise Marfleet Trustee 05 December 2019
KING'S ARMS TRUST (BEDFORD)
Received: On time
Robert Douglas Farquharson Trustee 27 February 2019
None on record
DAME SALLY COATES Trustee 04 July 2018
None on record
JAMES BARRINGTON HUW DARLEY Trustee 04 July 2018
NOW TEACH
Received: On time
ROMODELS
THE THINK AHEAD ORGANISATION
Received: On time