Accounts and annual returns EDUCATION AND FOOTBALL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1181712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 26 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 26 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 30 January 2024 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 30 January 2024 244 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 16 April 2023 320 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 16 April 2023 320 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 October 2021 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 26 October 2021 148 days late Download Open in new window