Trustees ABBEY PEOPLE CIO

Charity number: 1180560
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ross Irvine Trustee 16 November 2023
None on record
Abdul Hye Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Michael Kovacs Trustee 27 November 2021
None on record
Sharon Louise Secker Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
Joanna Catherine Bromwich Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
Henry Edward Jacob Kite Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
PETER GOTHAM Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
Lynsey Stafford Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
James Pilgrim Pilgrim Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
Justine Joy McLachlan Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
Joanne Brasher Trustee 05 July 2019
See Saw Pre-School CIO
Overdue by 15 days