Trustees CAMP SIMCHA

Charity number: 1180646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JULIAN DAVID TAYLOR Chair 23 July 2018
THE JULIAN TAYLOR CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
CAMP SIMCHA
Received: On time
Simon Jonathan Pollock Trustee 19 July 2023
None on record
Arieh Alexander Gilbert Trustee 28 March 2023
THE MSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Lisa Rochelle Scott Trustee 06 January 2023
None on record
Yisroel Meir Plancey Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Elaine Kerr Trustee 16 July 2020
None on record
Simon Harris Johnson Trustee 24 June 2020
THE BLOOM FOUNDATION
Received: 2 days late
Rabbi Stephen Mark Scholar Trustee 04 September 2019
None on record
Solomon Mayer Trustee 04 September 2019
None on record
Aviva Ruth Steinberg Trustee 05 March 2019
None on record
Alison Lisa Sonn Trustee 05 March 2019
None on record
Tanya Persey Trustee 05 March 2019
None on record
JEREMY PHILIP HERMAN Trustee 23 July 2018
None on record
PHILIP CHARLES GOODMAN Trustee 23 July 2018
CAMP SIMCHA
Received: On time
S.P. CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time