FOOD EXETER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Food Exeter's mission is to transform the local food system in Exeter, to make nutritious, local and sustainably produced food available and accessible to all. This includes addressing food poverty, food waste, health and social benefits of food. We work through facilitating and enabling local organisations to find joint, long term solutions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 22 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Johanna Franziska Korndorfer | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Johnson | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr REBECCA JANE SANDOVER | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.51k | £22.40k | £5.70k | £91 | £143 | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.81k | £25.34k | £11.88k | £2.35k | £391 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 22 Mar 2019 as amended on 28 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF EXETER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN ISSUES RELATING TO FOOD: INCLUDING HEALTH, ETHICS, ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL STUDIES, SCIENCE, PUBLIC POLICY. 2. TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED BY ENCOURAGING THE DEVELOPMENT OF HEALTHIER LIFESTYLES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL TRAINING, EDUCATION, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT ON NUTRITION, HEALTHY EATING AND THE IMPORTANCE OF A HEALTHY DIET TO EQUIP SUCH PERSONS TO MAKE MORE INFORMED HEALTH AND DIETARY CHOICES, LEADING TO AN IMPROVEMENT IN THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE. 3. TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: I. THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES; II. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; III. THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; IV. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS, PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. ÆSUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENTÆ MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o St Sidwells Centre
Sidwell Street
Exeter
EX4 6NN
- Phone:
- 07974414613
- Email:
- info@foodexeter.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window