Accounts and annual returns BACKWORTH RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 512684
Charity reporting is overdue by 1030 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 299 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 299 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 664 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 664 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1030 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1030 days
Annual return 30 September 2017 04 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 04 November 2017 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required