Accounts and annual returns 1ST HOUGHTON (ST MICHAELS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 512697
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 15 February 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required