Accounts and annual returns HOWARD WATSON SYMINGTON MEMORIAL CHARITY

Charity number: 512708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required