Financial history HOWARD WATSON SYMINGTON MEMORIAL CHARITY

Charity number: 512708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £13.66k £67.69k £86.67k £74.34k £75.02k
Total expenditure £22.76k £46.09k £64.86k £52.91k £37.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A