Accounts and annual returns SWANLAND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1180273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 March 2023 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 02 March 2023 122 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window