BARTH SYNDROME UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working throughout the UK, we assist families with Barth syndrome with support, information and access to expert care. We fund research into treatments and a cure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 31 January 2019: CIO registration
- 11 January 2020: Funds received from 1100835 BARTH SYNDROME TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RALPH STEVEN EASTERBROOK | Chair | 14 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Katarzyna Kozminska | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Laurence Ford | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Michelle Green | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelsey Leigh Doran | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Jayne Parish | Trustee | 14 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Malcolm Parish | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.94k | £31.01k | £11.85k | £79.37k | £25.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.09k | £44.84k | £46.14k | £60.57k | £33.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF INDIVIDUALS WITH, AND CARRIERS OF, BARTH SYNDROME AND THEIR FAMILIES, WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING ACCESS TO INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT IN RELATION TO THE CONDITION TO THE PUBLIC AND, IN PARTICULAR, DIAGNOSED INDIVIDUALS AND THEIR EXTENDED FAMILIES AND THOSE IN THE EDUCATIONAL, SCIENTIFIC, MEDICAL AND ALLIED HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONS. B) THE PROMOTION AND FUNDING OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF THE CONDITION AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THE SAME FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 THE VIKINGS
ROMSEY
SO51 5RG
- Phone:
- 01794518785
- Email:
- info@barthsyndrome.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window