BRADLEY PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bradley Playgroup provides pre-school sessions for children aged 2 years 3 months up to school age. The group operates from Bradley Village Hall, Glanllyn Road, Bradley, Wrexham LL11 4BB. The playgroup provides the first step on a child's learning ladder where they can socialise and learn through play.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Total income includes £6,264 from 1 government contract(s) and £24,318 from 9 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wrexham
Governance
- 13 August 2018: CIO registration
- 12 August 2019: Funds received from 1029613 BRADLEY PLAYGROUP
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLAIRE MICHELLE HARRISON | Chair | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Bickerton | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Beattie | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Beer | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Cooke | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Faye Whitby Jones | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Louise Levey | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Hesp | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
VERVAINE EDWARDS | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|||||
PAULA JANE PRITCHARD | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAREN ELIZABETH WHITBY | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Joanne Edwards | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.78k | £26.63k | £70.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.55k | £28.84k | £56.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £6.26k | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.63k | £4.77k | £24.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN WALES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THEIR NEEDS THROUGH HIGH QUALITY CHILDCARE PROVISION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bradley Village Hall
Glanllyn Road
Bradley
Wrexham
LL11 4BB
- Phone:
- 07547 691301
- Email:
- bradleyplaygroup@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window