Accounts and annual returns ROOTS AND WINGS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1179863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 10 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 23 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window