THE GUY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1181617
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

For the public benefit, to further such purposes as are charitable under the laws of England and Wales, primarily but not exclusively in Gloucestershire, Derbyshire, High Peak and Cambridgeshire, through the provision of grants to charities and individuals, in particular: i) The relief of poverty and financial hardship; ii) The advancement of education of young people; iii) The relief of sic

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 17 July 2020

Total income: £354,425
Total expenditure: £354,425

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 January 2019: CIO registration
  • 09 December 2020: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 09 December 2020: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 17/07/2020
Total gross income £354.43k
Total expenditure £354.43k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 17 July 2020 19 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 July 2020 19 August 2020 On Time