SAFFRON WALDEN CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community choir performing major choral works to a high standard and running singing workshops. Membership of approx 90 singers is drawn from a wide geographical area covering Essex, Hertfordshire, Suffolk, and Cambridgeshire. Main concert venues are Saffron Hall and St Mary's Church, Saffron Walden. The choir has close links with local schools, regularly sharing concerts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 28 September 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Phillips | Chair | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Emberson | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Griffiths | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hayden Rocks | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Walker | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES PETER SOLWAY | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Abigail Rosalind Booth | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Andrew Goldsmith | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Elizabeth Hall | Trustee | 04 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Edward Parker | Trustee | 04 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Lucy Thomson | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Hall | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.47k | £15.61k | £56.90k | £61.54k | £60.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.85k | £11.41k | £58.24k | £61.19k | £60.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £300 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £300 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Sep 2018 as amended on 18 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Conkers
Wenden Road
Arkesden
SAFFRON WALDEN
Essex
CB11 4HB
- Phone:
- 07818010399
- Email:
- chair@swchoral.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window