Financial history DERBYSHIRE HORSE AND PONY SOCIETY

Charity number: 512748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £746 £785 £15.05k £0 £0
Total expenditure £834 £3.20k £1.60k £24 £707
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A