THE VICKERS STAFF CHARITABLE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide relief for needy employees, ex-employees and their dependents, and to perform such charitable purposes as the trustee from time to time determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 02 July 1982: Standard registration
- VSCF (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARYLAND TRUST COMPANY (LEEDS) LIMITED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.16k | £393.69k | £1.54m | £24.91k | £45.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.83k | £186.08k | £215.44k | £303.24k | £115.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £86.13k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £1.45m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £215.44k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £1.44k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £204.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 02 September 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 02 September 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 27 September 2022 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 27 September 2022 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 14 September 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 14 September 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 30 September 2020 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 30 September 2020 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 MAY 1982
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEEDY EMPLOYEES AND EX-EMPLOYEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN SUCH MANNER AS IT SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS IT SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Benjamin R Vickers & Sons Ltd
Clarence Road
LEEDS
LS10 1ND
- Phone:
- 0113 386 7654
- Email:
- inbox@vickers-oil.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window