Accounts and annual returns OXTON & PRENTON DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1179657
Charity reporting is overdue by 144 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 144 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 144 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 March 2022 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 March 2021 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required