QUERCUS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1183580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trustees have a principal focus on support of a pre-eminent arboretum of the genus Quercus for the familiarisation and education of the public in oaks and of research into them. They also promote the protection of nature and especially of rare and endangered species of the oak genus. The Trustees use their income for these objects and may make grants to support others with similar objects.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £19,339
Total expenditure: £32,443

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 May 2019: Standard registration
  • 03 April 2024: Funds received from 280863 M F HEATHCOAT AMORY CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EDWARD FITZGERALD HEATHCOAT AMORY Chair 18 July 2018
None on record
Robert Miles Trustee 23 October 2020
None on record
JOHN ANDERSON Trustee 18 July 2018
None on record
Alice Mary Rose Thomson Trustee 18 July 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £11.77k £38.10k £19.34k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £117.49k £28.52k £32.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 03 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 17 February 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 August 2022 179 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 August 2022 544 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Chevithorne Barton
Chevithorne
Tiverton
Devon
EX16 7QB
Phone:
01884 254899