10 FINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
10 Fingers provides meal packages for new mothers and their families 10 Fingers will offer short courses to new mothers . e.g. A beginner's guide to HFX trading
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Enfield
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 18 December 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VICTORIA ADEPOJU | Chair | 18 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Adepoju | Trustee | 18 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eyewu Louise Walker-Nthenda | Trustee | 18 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £140 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2025 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE 1. TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE POVERTY OF NEW MOTHERS AND THEIR FAMILIES IN THE UK BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD PACKAGES AND ALL NECESSARY SUPPORT SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF NEW MOTHERS IN THE UK IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY PROVIDING: • SPACES AND ACTIVITIES TAILORED TO MEET THEIR EMOTIONAL AND PHYSICAL NEEDS • OPPORTUNITIES TO ENABLE NEW MOTHERS TO DEVELOP AND GAIN NEW SKILLS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Farriers End
BROXBOURNE
Hertfordshire
EN10 6BS
- Phone:
- 07903944095
- Email:
- 10fingers@mail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window