FRIENDS OF HAY SWIMMING POOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO are: 1. To advance the education of the public in water safety, primarily through providing swimming pool facilities for the use of Hay on Wye Primary School and other local school pupils: and, 2. In the interest of social welfare of the inhabitants of Hay on Wye and the surrounding area, to make swimming facilities available for recreation and
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Powys
Governance
- 28 September 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosalind Garratt | Trustee | 29 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
FIONA GILDA HOWARD | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Gareth William Ratcliffe | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.60k | £17.05k | £26.17k | £45.16k | £34.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.43k | £23.65k | £23.85k | £44.19k | £36.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 April 2021 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN WATER SAFETY, PRIMARILY THROUGH PROVIDING SWIMMING POOL FACILITIES FOR THE USE OF HAY ON WYE PRIMARY SCHOOL AND OTHER LOCAL SCHOOL PUPILS: AND, 2. IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF THE INHABITANTS OF HAY AND WYE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, TO MAKE SWIMMING FACILITIES AVAILABLE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN ORDER TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAY-ON-WYE SWIMMING POOL
OXFORD ROAD
HAY-ON-WYE
HEREFORD
HR3 5BT
- Phone:
- 07792348592
- Email:
- Hayswimmingpool@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window