Trustees WOODSTOCK ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1195315
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Phillip Robinson Chair 01 September 2003
None on record
Benjamin Jeremy Richard Goldenberg Trustee 01 September 2021
TRINITY CHURCH SUNDERLAND
Received: On time
David Alexander Birds Trustee 17 June 2020
None on record
Jonathan Michael Rabbitt Trustee 21 March 2019
THE OXFORD STUDIO ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
Anna Elizabeth Coles Trustee 21 March 2019
None on record
Johnathan David Davys Trustee 26 April 2017
None on record
Voon Yuen Loh Trustee 18 January 2017
None on record
Dr JAMES DANIEL WILKINSON Trustee 20 April 2016
None on record
JENNIFER ANNE REID Trustee 15 April 2015
None on record
David Malcolm Trebilcock Trustee 09 June 2010
None on record
JOHN ARTHUR SEVERN Trustee 28 March 2004
None on record