Accounts and annual returns LA BERGERIE CHRISTIAN CHURCH

Charity number: 1181471
Charity reporting is up to date (81 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 April 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 April 2022 81 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 February 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 February 2021 11 days late Download Open in new window