TALENT RISE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Talent RISE helps young people with employment barriers to prepare for, access and sustain supported employment and work experience opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 May 2019: CIO registration
- RISE UP (UK) (Working name)
- TALENT RISE (UK) (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darren Paul Wells | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard William Earl | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gregory Reed | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.78k | £108.14k | £96.02k | £186.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.72k | £108.18k | £95.60k | £115.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE DEFINED AS HAVING "BARRIERS TO EMPLOYMENT" BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND BY ORGANISING PROGRAMMES IN THE AREAS OF EMPLOYMENT SUPPORT, EDUCATION, MENTORING, SOCIAL SKILLS, LIFE SKILLS AND EMOTIONAL DEVELOPMENT AS A MEANS OF: (A) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. "BARRIERS TO EMPLOYMENT" MEANS UNFAVOURABLE CIRCUMSTANCES OR CONDITIONS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HEALTH CHALLENGES, LOW EDUCATIONAL ATTAINMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC STATUS, THAT REDUCE AN INDIVIDUALÆS CHANCES OF SUCCESS OR EFFECTIVENESS IN OBTAINING EMPLOYMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RISE UP, Unit 3.1
Sevendale House
7 Dale Street
MANCHESTER
M1 1JA
- Phone:
- 07842571309
- Email:
- Roman.dibden@riseupuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window