Trustees BRECON BEACONS PARK SOCIETY

Charity number: 1180841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Vivian Buckle Chair 26 November 2018
None on record
David Burden Trustee 10 June 2023
BRECON ADVICE CENTRE
Received: On time
VISION NORTH SOMERSET
Received: On time
Janet Callear Trustee 10 June 2023
None on record
Katherine Jordan Trustee 10 June 2023
None on record
Kathryn Susan Silk Trustee 21 May 2022
None on record
Derek John Thomas Trustee 21 May 2022
None on record
Roy Manning Trustee 21 May 2022
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Hoddell BSc Trustee 23 June 2021
None on record
Philip Bernard O'Shea Trustee 23 June 2021
None on record
Iau Counsell Trustee 26 November 2019
None on record
DAVID FRANK THOMAS Trustee 26 November 2018
None on record
Dr Richard James Chandler Trustee 26 November 2018
None on record
JAMES MCBRIAR WILSON Trustee 26 November 2018
None on record
Elizabeth Margaret Bairstow Gibbs Trustee 26 November 2018
None on record