TOOLEY'S BOATYARD TRUST

Charity number: 1182371

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT STEPHEN LANGTON Trustee 19 March 2019 None on record
YASMIN KADUJI Trustee 18 August 2020 None on record
ROBERT LEWIS ODDY Trustee 10 September 2019 None on record
JOHN ROGER MADDEN Chair 19 March 2019 None on record
DANIEL HUGH CLACHER Trustee 19 March 2019 None on record
MARTIN FREDERICK BACH PHILLIPS Trustee 30 September 2019
THE BLOXHAM VILLAGE MUSEUM Received: On time
THE GLEBE RECREATIONAL CHARITY (274960) Received: On time
Lisa-Marie Mallier Trustee 28 September 2021 None on record
OWEN JAMES KYFFIN Trustee 27 November 2019 None on record
Dr Catherine Saffin Trustee 27 March 2019 None on record
JOHN ERNEST SPRATT Trustee 19 March 2019
THE BANBURY MUSEUM TRUST Overdue by 262 days