BILAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 February 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUSA SINERA TOURAY | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ebrahima Camara Kabba | Trustee | 21 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALIEU SAIDY KHAN | Trustee | 21 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Sarjo Fatty | Trustee | 21 September 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.33k | £9.91k | £18.36k | £15.72k | £6.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.92k | £6.51k | £1.54k | £1.58k | £900 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 October 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 September 2023 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM ACCORDING TO THE QURAN THE SUNNAH AND HADITH BY MEANS OF, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A MOSQUE AND MADRASSAH IN WAKEFIELD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Mackie Road
Crigglestone
WAKEFIELD
WF4 3FS
- Phone:
- 07920799544
- Email:
- Bilalcommunitya@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window