Governing document ST CUTHBERT'S CARE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 JUN 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 MAR 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 JAN 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 MAR 2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
TO UNDERTAKE ALL SUCH FORMS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WORK AS THE CHARITY WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE BISHOP CONSIDERS APPROPRIATE (BEING FORMS OF WORK WHICH ARE LAWFUL CHARITABLE OBJECTS) INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) ACTING AS AN ADOPTION AGENCY OR CHARITY WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE CHILDREN ACTS OR ADOPTION ACTS FOR THE TIME BEING IN FORCE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.