ST CUTHBERT'S CARE

Charity number: 512912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Kathryn Mannix FRCP Trustee 24 January 2020 None on record
Nicholas Alexander Gilbert Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
kathleen Urwin Trustee 01 April 2015 None on record
Alexandra Jane Johnson Trustee 24 January 2020 None on record
MICHAEL GEORGE DICKSON Trustee 29 October 2012 None on record
Right Reverend Robert John Byrne CO Trustee 25 March 2019 None on record
Paul Moran Trustee 01 May 2014 None on record
MOIRA HELEN ASHMAN Trustee 01 April 2015 None on record