THE JUDITH AND BARRY JACKSON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To hold the capital and income of the trust fund upon trust to apply the income, and all or such part or parts of the capital, at such time or times and in such a manner to,or for the benefit of,such exclusively charitable objects and purposes in the city of Lincoln and counties of Lincolnshire and North Lincolnshire as the trustees in their discretion think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 04 January 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN ABIGAIL KNIGHT | Trustee | 25 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
JILL ANN WILKINSON | Trustee | 25 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROBYN AMANDA HOWARD | Trustee | 25 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
DORA JUDITH JACKSON | Trustee | 25 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.39k | £16.04k | £15.48k | £16.58k | £19.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.00k | £24.72k | £1.08k | £1.08k | £720 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 MAR 2011
Charitable objects
TO HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN THE CITY OF LINCOLN AND COUNTIES OF LINCOLNSHIRE AND NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AS THE TRUSTEE MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Chart House
Ridley Hill
Kingswear
DARTMOUTH
Devon
TQ6 0BY
- Phone:
- 07885717205
- Email:
- JILLANDMARK@ME.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window