Accounts and annual returns ADVAITA VEDANTA SADHANA

Charity number: 1181115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 29 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 12 June 2021 317 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required