THE DAVEY CONSORT CIO

Charity number: 1180917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOSEPHINE NINA FITZALAN HOWARD Trustee 10 March 2019 None on record
RYAN JAMES WRIGGLESWORTH Trustee 01 December 2018 None on record
His Honour Hugh William Patrick Eccles QC Trustee 19 January 2020 None on record
Richard Andrew Fitzalan Howard Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
RODERICK BLYTH Trustee 14 April 2019 None on record
Rev JOHN MALCOLM ANDREW OSMAN Trustee 01 December 2018 None on record
JOHN MURPHY Chair 01 December 2018 None on record
FRANCIS WILLIAM DUNSTAN BEVAN Trustee 30 November 2020 None on record
Sophie Anna Magdalena Bevan MBE Trustee 28 July 2019 None on record