RUTHIN MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide and maintain sporting facility for the use of both Ruthin Cricket and Football Clubs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 08 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryn Lloyd Jones | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alun Lloyd Jones | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Wynne Davies | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gareth John Maldwyn Edwards | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2019 | 30/10/2020 | 30/10/2021 | 30/10/2022 | 30/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £19.93k | £21.88k | £28.85k | £6.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £21.16k | £16.31k | £13.90k | £28.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £16.00k | £22.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | 17 April 2024 | 231 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 329 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | 01 December 2021 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | 07 June 2022 | 281 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2019 | 01 December 2021 | 458 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2019 | 07 June 2022 | 646 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 08 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF RUTHIN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PHYSICAL HEALTH AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF PLAYING FIELDS AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH LAND FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS, AND TO MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE THE FABRIC AND FACILITIES OF THE LAND SO THAT IT IS ALWAYS AVAILABLE FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ruthin Memorial Playing Fileds
Parc y Dre
Ruthin
LL15 1PH
- Phone:
- 01824707747
- Email:
- sk@spkell.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window