Accounts and annual returns CROFTON LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1180266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 06 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 06 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 27 May 2021 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 27 May 2021 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 02 July 2020 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 02 July 2020 63 days late Download Open in new window