IMIX

Charity number: 1183693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Liberda-Moreni Trustee 13 July 2021 None on record
Rachael Oliver Trustee 06 December 2019 None on record
SHAZIA EJAZ Trustee 10 October 2018 None on record
Zeno Onokaye-Akaka Trustee 15 January 2020 None on record
Dolores Modern Trustee 13 July 2021 None on record
Geraldine Blake Chair 09 September 2018 None on record
Agnes Estibals Trustee 13 July 2021 None on record
PHOEBE GRIFFITH Trustee 10 October 2018 None on record