THE SULLIVAN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1180164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General charitable activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 06 August 2024

Total income: £11,690
Total expenditure: £11,905

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 October 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Geraldine Sullivan Chair 06 August 2018
None on record
CHARLES ANTHONY SULLIVAN Trustee 02 October 2018
EDGELEY ROC CENTRE
Received: 7 days late
CAMILLA FARRAR Trustee 02 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/08/2020 06/08/2021 06/08/2022 06/08/2023 06/08/2024
Total gross income £2.00k £0 £20.00k £5.00k £11.69k
Total expenditure £0 £12.23k £14.14k £13.80k £11.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 August 2024 12 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 06 August 2023 07 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 06 August 2022 30 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 06 August 2021 12 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 06 August 2020 24 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Apartment 6
Fernleigh House
77-79 Alderley Road
WILMSLOW
Cheshire
SK9 1PA
Phone:
07788687471
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available