Dogfen lywodraethu FAMILY CARE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/08/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/04/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/12/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PRESERVATION AND PROMOTION OF THE MENTAL, SPIRITUAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY: (A) ARRANGING AND SUPPORTING THE ADOPTION OF CHILDREN WITH SUITABLE PERSONS AND FAMILIES; (B) PROMOTING AND ASSISTING IN THE WELFARE OF ADOPTED PERSONS, BIRTH PARENTS AND ADOPTIVE PARENTS; (C) PROVIDING EMOTIONAL SUPPORT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES; (D) PROVIDING TRAINING AND ADVICE AND SUPPORT IN THE SAFEGUARDING OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND VULNERABLE ADULTS FROM ABUSE.
Maes buddion
DIOCESE OF SOUTHWELL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.