THE WISTON MEETING PLACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Wiston Meeting Place Trustees manage a community building and open space. The facility is hired to local residents, local clubs, community groups and organisations and for private events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 16 January 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS K GORING | Chair | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MS A STALEY | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS S PEILL | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA LUCKIN | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS B HOUGHTON | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS L WOODAGE | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS R LUCKIN | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.46k | £2.17k | £2.88k | £5.72k | £6.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £935 | £2.50k | £2.63k | £4.49k | £5.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (I) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WISTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND (II) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Area of benefit
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WISTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE WISTON MEETING PLACE
The Old Post Office
Water Lane
Wiston
STEYNING
BN44 3DW
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- wistonvillage@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window